TN SB1640 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds as an act that constitutes the offense of engaging in a deceptive business practice, a violation of the Tennessee Trade Mark Act, and a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act the use of the trade name or trademark, or a confusingly similar trade name or trademark of any place of entertainment, or the name of any event, person, or entity scheduled to perform at a place of entertainment in the domain or subdomain of a ticket marketplace URL. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, adds as an act that constitutes the offense of engaging in a deceptive business practice, a violation of the Tennessee Trade Mark Act, and a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act the use of the trade name or trademark, or a confusingly similar trade name or trademark of any place of entertainment, or the name of any event, person, or entity scheduled to perform at a place of entertainment in the domain or subdomain of a ticket marketplace URL. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 930 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/15/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0879) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (HA0879) |
2018-04-12 | House | Am. reconsidered. |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate returned. |
2018-04-09 | House | Requested S. to return. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0879) |
2018-04-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0707) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930