TN HB2139 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds as an act that constitutes the offense of engaging in a deceptive business practice, a violation of the Tennessee Trade Mark Act, and a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act the use of the trade name or trademark, or a confusingly similar trade name or trademark of any place of entertainment, or the name of any event, person, or entity scheduled to perform at a place of entertainment in the domain or subdomain of a ticket marketplace URL. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, adds as an act that constitutes the offense of engaging in a deceptive business practice, a violation of the Tennessee Trade Mark Act, and a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act the use of the trade name or trademark, or a confusingly similar trade name or trademark of any place of entertainment, or the name of any event, person, or entity scheduled to perform at a place of entertainment in the domain or subdomain of a ticket marketplace URL. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930 | |
2018-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1640 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 930