TN SB1612 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accessible Transportation and Mobility Act of 2020." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 23; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accessible Transportation and Mobility Act of 2020." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 23; Title 54 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 600 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0525) |
2020-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0487) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/12/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1596 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600