TN HB1596 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accessible Transportation and Mobility Act of 2020." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 23; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accessible Transportation and Mobility Act of 2020." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 23; Title 54 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1612 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 600