TN SB1586 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a process by which an attorney in fact can petition a court to establish a lost power of attorney instrument. - Amends TCA Title 34, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, establishes a process by which an attorney in fact can petition a court to establish a lost power of attorney instrument. - Amends TCA Title 34, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1872 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee