TN SB1446 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises fee-related provisions of the Uniform Debt Management Services Act. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55.
Title
As enacted, revises fee-related provisions of the Uniform Debt Management Services Act. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Pub. Ch. 639 |
2014-04-14 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-27 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-25 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/10/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-12-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1394 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 639