TN SB1344 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts employers and employees who have been convicted of certain disqualifying offenses from the prohibition on coming into direct contact with school children or children in a child care program, if 20 or more years have elapsed between the date of conviction of the offense and the date on which the criminal history records check is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, exempts employers and employees who have been convicted of certain disqualifying offenses from the prohibition on coming into direct contact with school children or children in a child care program, if 20 or more years have elapsed between the date of conviction of the offense and the date on which the criminal history records check is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0767 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning