TN HB0767 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts employers and employees who have been convicted of certain disqualifying offenses from the prohibition on coming into direct contact with school children or children in a child care program, if 20 or more years have elapsed between the date of conviction of the offense and the date on which the criminal history records check is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, exempts employers and employees who have been convicted of certain disqualifying offenses from the prohibition on coming into direct contact with school children or children in a child care program, if 20 or more years have elapsed between the date of conviction of the offense and the date on which the criminal history records check is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 1/16/2018 |
2017-04-18 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1344 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee