TN SB1297 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, redefines "public place" for purposes of the offense of indecent exposure; includes a restroom, locker room, dressing room, or shower, designated for multi-person, single-sex use. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, redefines "public place" for purposes of the offense of indecent exposure; includes a restroom, locker room, dressing room, or shower, designated for multi-person, single-sex use. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1151 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 251

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback