TN HB1151 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "public place" for purposes of the offense of indecent exposure; includes a restroom, locker room, dressing room, or shower, designated for multi-person, single-sex use. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, redefines "public place" for purposes of the offense of indecent exposure; includes a restroom, locker room, dressing room, or shower, designated for multi-person, single-sex use. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 251 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 21, Nays 5 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0162) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 25, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0194) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1297 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251