TN SB1280 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles criminal investigators to be compensated at a rate equal to 35 percent of the annual compensation of the district attorney general, with compensation rate increases for 20 years until the compensation rate equals 55 percent of the annual compensation of the district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 16.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 16, relative to the compensation of public officers and employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |