TN SB1123 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits state entities subject to review under the Tennessee Governmental Entity Review Law from promulgating rules or adopting policies to exempt members of such entities from rulemaking or policy requirements solely by virtue of their status as members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 1, relative to state agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Effective date(s) 03/23/2021 | |
2021-03-29 | Pub. Ch. 37 | |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2021-03-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37