TN HB1055 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits state entities subject to review under the Tennessee Governmental Entity Review Law from promulgating rules or adopting policies to exempt members of such entities from rulemaking or policy requirements solely by virtue of their status as members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 1, relative to state agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37 | |
2021-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1123 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2021