TN SB1057 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "March Madness and Fantasy Football Freedom Act," which decriminalizes, under certain circumstances, wagers on fantasy sports leagues and sports pools. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "March Madness and Fantasy Football Freedom Act," which decriminalizes, under certain circumstances, wagers on fantasy sports leagues and sports pools. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 126 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 16, PNV 4 |
2019-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1033 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 126