TN HB1033 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "March Madness and Fantasy Football Freedom Act," wich decriminalizes, under certain circumstances, wagers on fantasy sports leagues and sports pools. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "March Madness and Fantasy Football Freedom Act," wich decriminalizes, under certain circumstances, wagers on fantasy sports leagues and sports pools. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 126
2019-03-28HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1057 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 126

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback