TN SB0935 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Congressional Redistricting Commission Act," which establishes a five-member congressional redistricting commission beginning in January 2021. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16; Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Congressional Redistricting Commission Act," which establishes a five-member congressional redistricting commission beginning in January 2021. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16; Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1409 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee