TN SB0760 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide students with characteristics of dyslexia appropriate tiered dyslexia-specific intervention through services provided by a teacher trained in dyslexia intervention; requires the department of education to employ at least one dyslexia specialist beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide students with characteristics of dyslexia appropriate tiered dyslexia-specific intervention through services provided by a teacher trained in dyslexia intervention; requires the department of education to employ at least one dyslexia specialist beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0253 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education