TN HB0253 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires LEAs to provide students with characteristics of dyslexia appropriate tiered dyslexia-specific intervention through services provided by a teacher trained in dyslexia intervention; requires the department of education to employ at least one dyslexia specialist beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires LEAs to provide students with characteristics of dyslexia appropriate tiered dyslexia-specific intervention through services provided by a teacher trained in dyslexia intervention; requires the department of education to employ at least one dyslexia specialist beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0760 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback