TN SB0756 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, tolls the statute of limitations for collection of taxes upon the imposition of a bankruptcy stay or upon the filing of a probate, receivership, or assignment for benefit of creditors proceeding; permits statute of limitations to begin running 30 days after the stay is lifted or the proceeding prohibiting collection ends. - Amends TCA Section 67-1-1429.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-1-1429, relative to the statute of limitations for tax collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217 | |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0084 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021