TN HB0084 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, tolls the statute of limitations for collection of taxes upon the imposition of a bankruptcy stay or upon the filing of a probate, receivership, or assignment for benefit of creditors proceeding; permits statute of limitations to begin running 30 days after the stay is lifted or the proceeding prohibiting collection ends. - Amends TCA Section 67-1-1429.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-1-1429, relative to the statute of limitations for tax collection.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 217 | |
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0756 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217