TN SB0733 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of GW,H&HR Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of GW,H&HR Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises credentialing requirement for reimbursement at federally qualified health centers and encourages outreach efforts of eligible persons at community health centers under the Coverkids program. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, revises credentialing requirement for reimbursement at federally qualified health centers and encourages outreach efforts of eligible persons at community health centers under the Coverkids program. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of GW,H&HR Comm | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0410 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0733&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0733.pdf |