TN SB0713 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a recipient of the Air Medal (meritorious) to be exempt from renewal fees for the recipient's Air Medal (meritorious) license plate, if the recipient was stationed on active-duty service outside Tennessee before May 13, 2013, which is the date after which Air Medal (meritorious) license plates were no longer free. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-231.
Title
As introduced, allows a recipient of the Air Medal (meritorious) to be exempt from renewal fees for the recipient's Air Medal (meritorious) license plate, if the recipient was stationed on active-duty service outside Tennessee before May 13, 2013, which is the date after which Air Medal (meritorious) license plates were no longer free. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-231.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0533 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0713&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0713.pdf |