TN SB0631 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires students to complete one year of instruction in American government and one year of instruction in Tennessee history between grades 7 and 12 to receive a high school diploma, with various exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires students to complete one year of instruction in American government and one year of instruction in Tennessee history between grades 7 and 12 to receive a high school diploma, with various exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0398) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0452) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0361) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0344) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0727 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.