TN SB0584 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows person applying for certificate of title for rebuilt vehicle to use as support either permit to dismantle or presently authorized salvage title. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, allows person applying for certificate of title for rebuilt vehicle to use as support either permit to dismantle or presently authorized salvage title. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0750 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to s/c Small Business of COM
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0584&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0584.pdf |