TN SB0498 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the department of environment and conservation to submit its annual report, in electronic format, on program expenditures from administering the tire environmental program to the office of legislative budget analysis and the chair of the transportation and safety committee of the senate, chair of the transportation committee of the house of representatives, and the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 54 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54 and Title 68, relative to tires.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0926 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.