TN SB0491 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Public Charter Schools Act, including eliminating caps on the number of charter schools and changing requirements for charter schools' prospective student population. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Public Charter Schools Act, including eliminating caps on the number of charter schools and changing requirements for charter schools' prospective student population. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0505 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0491&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0491.pdf |