TN SB0473 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Freedom to Prosper Act" to limit the circumstances under which local government entities may regulate certain occupations. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Freedom to Prosper Act" to limit the circumstances under which local government entities may regulate certain occupations. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 332 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0484) |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 2 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0225) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0301) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. C&L Comm. 4-3-17 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0979 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332