TN HB0979 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Freedom to Prosper Act" to limit the circumstances under which local government entities may regulate certain occupations. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Freedom to Prosper Act" to limit the circumstances under which local government entities may regulate certain occupations. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332 | |
2017-05-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0473 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 332