TN SB0436 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes discretion of county boards of equalization to not hold complaint hearings virtually if each participant in the hearing has an opportunity to participate in, to hear, and, if technically feasible, to see the entire proceedings while taking place. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-1407.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-5-1407, relative to personal appearance requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0230 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration