TN SB0434 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 1/1/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 1/1/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, delays effective date of rules until reviewed by joint government operations committees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, delays effective date of rules until reviewed by joint government operations committees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 1/1/2010 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 06/01/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 5/22/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/18/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0423 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0434&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0434.pdf |