TN SB0421 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows the sale of 12 ounce products in middle schools. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2307.
Title
As introduced, allows the sale of 12 ounce products in middle schools. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2307.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-03-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-19 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 1 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/19/2009 | |
2009-03-16 | S. Reset on cal. for 3/19/09 | |
2009-03-16 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/19/2009 | |
2009-03-13 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/16/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/10/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0874 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee