TN SB0293 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the comptroller of the treasury to audit private probation service providers; allows the comptroller to appoint a certified public accountant to conduct the audit; requires the probation service provider to pay for the audit. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-302.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the comptroller of the treasury to audit private probation service providers; allows the comptroller to appoint a certified public accountant to conduct the audit; requires the probation service provider to pay for the audit. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-302.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 148 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/17/2019 | |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0108) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0108) |
2019-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0203 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148