TN HB0203 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the comptroller of the treasury to audit private probation service providers; allows the comptroller to appoint a certified public accountant to conduct the audit; requires the probation service provider to pay for the audit. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the comptroller of the treasury to audit private probation service providers; allows the comptroller to appoint a certified public accountant to conduct the audit; requires the probation service provider to pay for the audit. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-302.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0293 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback