TN SB0292 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a teacher to remove a disruptive student from the classroom pursuant to local board policies. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, allows a teacher to remove a disruptive student from the classroom pursuant to local board policies. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0569 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-07 - Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 2016
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0292&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0292.pdf |