TN SB0291 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to provide each nurse, paramedic, and emergency medical technician who is a resident of this state and has provided healthcare services during the effective period of the state of emergency declared by the governor in Executive Order No. 14 on March 12, 2020, with a one-time stipend of $1,500. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |