TN SB0287 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 275
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 275
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that actions that could be brought for trespass or nuisance in connection with the exercise of eminent domain be brought within 12 months after the land has been actually taken possession of and the work of proposed improvement begun. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, requires that actions that could be brought for trespass or nuisance in connection with the exercise of eminent domain be brought within 12 months after the land has been actually taken possession of and the work of proposed improvement begun. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 275 | |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0137 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 275