TN SB0271 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "base period" for determining weekly benefit amounts and other purposes under the Tennessee Employment Security Law by reducing the number of completed calendar quarters immediately preceding the first day of the individual's benefit year from four or five to two. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, redefines "base period" for determining weekly benefit amounts and other purposes under the Tennessee Employment Security Law by reducing the number of completed calendar quarters immediately preceding the first day of the individual's benefit year from four or five to two. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0208 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee