TN SB0088 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the current schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program that requires testing to occur during a two-week window by the first Monday on or after April 22; authorizes the commissioner of education to establish a schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6002.
Title
As enacted, deletes the current schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program that requires testing to occur during a two-week window by the first Monday on or after April 22; authorizes the commissioner of education to establish a schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6002.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 184 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2015 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0078 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184