TN HB0078 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the current schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program that requires testing to occur during a two-week window by the first Monday on or after April 22; authorizes the commissioner of education to establish a schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6002.
Title
As enacted, deletes the current schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program that requires testing to occur during a two-week window by the first Monday on or after April 22; authorizes the commissioner of education to establish a schedule for the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6002.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184 | |
2015-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0088 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 184
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0078&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0078.pdf |