CA AB2245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44910 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
Certificated school employees: permanent status: regional occupational centers or programs operated by single school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2245 Juan Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2245 Juan Carrillo By Cortese (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2245 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2245 Juan Carrillo By Cortese (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2245 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 956, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 11.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 4.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44910 | New Code | See Bill Text |