TN SB0016 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a person petitioning for a certificate of employability does not have to be in the process of restoring the person's rights of citizenship. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that a person petitioning for a certificate of employability does not have to be in the process of restoring the person's rights of citizenship. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 83 | |
2017-04-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0009) |
2017-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0007) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/7/2017 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/7/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/31/2017 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0128 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 83