TN SB0014 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases the penalty for drag racing from a Class B misdemeanor to a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 55, relative to drag racing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 573
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/11/2021
2021-03-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2021
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-03SenateRecalled from Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-12-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0022 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 573

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback