TN SB0008 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a retired high school teacher whose license has lapsed to teach one year without loss of retirement benefits if no qualified teacher can be found and certain other requirements are met. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-821; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, permits a retired high school teacher whose license has lapsed to teach one year without loss of retirement benefits if no qualified teacher can be found and certain other requirements are met. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-821; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0005 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0008&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0008.pdf |