TN HB0005 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a retired high school teacher whose license has lapsed to teach one year without loss of retirement benefits if no qualified teacher can be found and certain other requirements are met. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-821; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, permits a retired high school teacher whose license has lapsed to teach one year without loss of retirement benefits if no qualified teacher can be found and certain other requirements are met. - Amends TCA Section 8-36-821; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-12-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0008 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0005&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0005.pdf |