TN HJR0788 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Wayne Gregg
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of former LaFollette Fire Chief Wayne Gregg.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-02-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-02-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-02-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-10 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2022-02-07 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |