TN HJR0737 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
David "Davy" Crockett & the Crockett Family Reunion 2012
Title
David "Davy" Crockett & the Crockett Family Reunion 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-15 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-12 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-08 | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-05 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Filed for intro. |