TN HB3877 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the city election to coincide with the November general election beginning in 2014; extends the four-year terms of office of officials elected in the May 2009 election to the first Tuesday in November 2014, and the terms of officials elected in the May 2011 election to the first Tuesday in November 2016. - Amends Chapter 179 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the city election to coincide with the November general election beginning in 2014; extends the four-year terms of office of officials elected in the May 2009 election to the first Tuesday in November 2014, and the terms of officials elected in the May 2011 election to the first Tuesday in November 2016. - Amends Chapter 179 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pr. Ch. 72 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-27 | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-27 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-26 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-03-29 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-03-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3805 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 72