TN SB3805 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the city election to coincide with the November general election beginning in 2014; extends the four-year terms of office of officials elected in the May 2009 election to the first Tuesday in November 2014, and the terms of officials elected in the May 2011 election to the first Tuesday in November 2016. - Amends Chapter 179 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the city election to coincide with the November general election beginning in 2014; extends the four-year terms of office of officials elected in the May 2009 election to the first Tuesday in November 2014, and the terms of officials elected in the May 2011 election to the first Tuesday in November 2016. - Amends Chapter 179 of the Private Acts of 1923; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 72 | |
2012-04-27 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-03-26 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2012-03-22 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-03-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3877 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 72