TN HB3072 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates local emergency management agency trust fund; creates qualifications for local emergency management directors. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 58, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, creates local emergency management agency trust fund; creates qualifications for local emergency management directors. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 58, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2812 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3072&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3072.pdf |