TN HB3046 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that TRA has no power in regard to standards for carbon dioxide transported via interstate pipeline that is subject to the federal Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act.
Title
As enacted, specifies that TRA has no power in regard to standards for carbon dioxide transported via interstate pipeline that is subject to the federal Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846 | |
2010-04-14 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Utilities & Banking of COM for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Utilities & Banking of COM | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 846
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3046&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3046.pdf |